Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 419 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5406 Week
» 13521 Month
» 140964 Year
» 1806340 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2587 on 14/10/1936
British Railways 42587 w/e 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P14/10/1936
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L896
Works Number 24343
To Service Mon 14/10/1936
Withdrawal Mon 12/06/1967
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/10/1936
6A   Chester (MR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 06/10/1956
14C   St Albans w/e 04/04/1959
17A   Derby w/e 06/02/1960
16A   Nottingham w/e 04/03/1961
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 06/07/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/11/1964
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 12/11/1966
56F   Low Moor w/e 29/04/1967
     Withdrawn on 12/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 14C St Albans 4w/e 28/03/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 12/11/1966
LOAN 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region w/e 29/04/1967
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 20/05/1967
WDN   on 12/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1943 Crewe Works Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. SLS/194401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/10/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2587
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24343
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Chester (MR) (6A)    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42587    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
04/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Albans (14C)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
12/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42587    
01/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev