Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 23 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 6388 Month
» 133831 Year
» 1799207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2588 on 20/10/1936
British Railways 42588 w/e 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P20/10/1936
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L896
Works Number 24344
To Service Sat 20/10/1936
Withdrawal Sat 24/10/1964
Service Life 28 yrs , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/10/1936
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 17/09/1949
7B   Bangor w/e 10/06/1950
7B   Bangor 2w/e 17/06/1950
26D   Bury 4w/e 06/10/1956
14D   Neasden 4w/e 04/10/1958
14B   Kentish Town w/e 21/05/1960
16A   Nottingham w/e 16/09/1961
     Withdrawn on 24/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 06/10/1956
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 24/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/12/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. SLS/196201
04/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. SLS/196202
15/11/1964 Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/10/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2588
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24344
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
30/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42588    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
24/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42588    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev