Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 299 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2000 Week
» 10115 Month
» 137558 Year
» 1802934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2594 on 02/11/1936
British Railways 42594 w/e 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P02/11/1936
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L896
Works Number 24350
To Service Sat 02/11/1936
Withdrawal Sat 25/04/1964
Service Life 27 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/11/1936
11B   Barrow in Furness on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9A   Longsight w/e 10/07/1948
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 30/11/1957
6H   Bangor w/e 25/07/1959
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 05/09/1959
12G   Oxenholme w/e 09/07/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 16/06/1962
     Withdrawn on 25/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 9A Longsight w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 12G Oxenholme 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 25/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/02/1958 LMR regional adjustments In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. SLS/195802

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/11/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2594
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24350
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B)    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
25/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42594    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
09/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxenholme (12G)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
25/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42594    
05/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev