|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Broadheath-Lymm-Warrington Section | The local passenger service to and from Manchester (London Road) continues to be worked mainly by Fowler and Stanier 2-6-2T's, Stanier 2-6-4T's, ex L. & Y. 2-4-2T's and Class '2' 4-4-0 No. 674. The latter makes one 'afternoon trip from Warrington to London Road and back. Morning turns are usually handled by 2-6-2T's Nos. 2, 6 o 7 and one of the three ex-L. & Y. 2-4-2T's (Nos. 10697, 10703 or 10705). No. 71 (9A) is the most regular Stanier 2-6-2T, and 2606 (BA) the most usual 2-6-4T on duty. A couple of trips from Warrington to Broadheath and back are usually sandwiched in between its other duties by the Hartford motor train which is pushed or pulled by Webb 2-4-2T No. 6603 o 6668. The fairly heavy freight traffic is shared fairly equally between ex L.N.W. 0-8-0's and Class '8F' 2-8-0's, while the working of the Arpley-Broadheath tranships train is invariably entrusted to one of the several ex Midland Class '3' 0-6-0's shedded at Warrington | SLS/194810 |
31/12/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. | SLS/196202 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/12/1936 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2606 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24362 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
25/06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42606 | ||
14/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
25/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bangor (6H) | ||
12/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
26/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) | ||
15/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42606 | ||
04/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |