Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 308 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2009 Week
» 10124 Month
» 137567 Year
» 1802943 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2615 on 01/02/1937
British Railways 42615 w/e 02/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P01/02/1937
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L896
Works Number 24371
To Service Sat 01/02/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/09/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 01/02/1937
11A   Carnforth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2A   Rugby w/e 30/09/1950
2A   Rugby 4w/e 07/10/1950
2E   Northampton w/e 22/11/1958
6H   Bangor w/e 01/07/1961
1E   Bletchley w/e 16/09/1961
1A   Willesden w/e 23/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 29/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 6A Chester (MR) w/e 06/03/1948
EXLOAN 11A Carnforth w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 29/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/02/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2615
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24371
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A)    
02/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42615    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
29/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42615    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev