Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 272 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1973 Week
» 10088 Month
» 137531 Year
» 1802907 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2616 on 01/02/1937
British Railways 42616 w/e 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P01/02/1937
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L896
Works Number 24372
To Service Sat 01/02/1937
Withdrawal During 10/1967
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 01/02/1937
3D   Aston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24K   Preston w/e 08/11/1958
3D   Aston w/e 15/11/1958
1A   Willesden w/e 12/12/1959
3D   Aston w/e 02/01/1960
1A   Willesden w/e 25/02/1961
6H   Bangor w/e 08/07/1961
1C   Watford w/e 16/09/1961
1A   Willesden w/e 03/04/1965
5D   Stoke w/e 26/06/1965
10A   Carnforth w/e 24/07/1965
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 12/02/1966
91E   To Eastern Region w/e 27/05/1967
56F   Low Moor 4w/e 17/06/1967
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24K Preston 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 3D Aston 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 1C Watford 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 1A Willesden 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 12/03/1966
LOAN 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 10/06/1967
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 17/06/1967
WDN   on 30/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1964 Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/02/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2616
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24372
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D)    
25/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42616    
08/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (24K)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42616    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev