Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 38 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4665 Week
» 6403 Month
» 133846 Year
» 1799222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2618 on 21/06/1938
British Railways 42618 w/e 25/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P21/06/1938
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 21/06/1938
Withdrawal Mon 12/07/1965 off Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)
Service Life 27 yrs , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/06/1938
26A   Newton Heath on 09/07/1938
26C   Bolton on 10/04/1957
26A   Newton Heath on 07/06/1958
14D   Neasden (on loan) on 01/09/1958
14D   Neasden on 05/10/1958
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield on 13/11/1961
55H   Neville Hill (on loan) on 12/03/1964
55H   Neville Hill on 22/03/1964
55G   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 07/06/1964
     Withdrawn on 12/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 91NE   4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 55H Neville Hill 5w/e 11/04/1964
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   on 12/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/06/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2618
Built at Derby Works
   
09/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
25/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42618    
10/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
07/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
01/09/1958 Allocation Loaned to Neasden (14D)    
05/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
13/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
12/03/1964 Allocation Loaned to Neville Hill (55H)    
22/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
07/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
12/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42618 from Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
11/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev