Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2690 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16096 Week
» 69112 Month
» 188639 Year
» 3215492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2621 |
on |
06/07/1938 |
British Railways |
42621 |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 06/07/1938 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/11/1962 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
27C |
Southport |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
ALLOC |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
3w/e |
26/09/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/07/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2621 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42621 |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42621 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|