Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 787 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18590 Week
» 71606 Month
» 191133 Year
» 3217986 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2626 |
on |
05/08/1938 |
British Railways |
42626 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 05/08/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 23/10/1965 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
05/08/1938 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26C |
|
Bolton |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/10/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/08/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2626 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42626 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42626 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|