Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17911 Week
» 70927 Month
» 190454 Year
» 3217307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2674 |
on |
04/04/1945 |
British Railways |
42674 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 04/04/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 04/01/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
3E |
Monument Lane |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
3E |
Monument Lane |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
6H |
Bangor |
6w/e |
11/07/1959 |
LOAN |
14D |
Neasden |
5w/e |
02/01/1960 |
EXLOAN |
6H |
Bangor |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
24/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/04/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2674 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42674 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
13/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42674 |
|
|
04/01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|