Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 297 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1998 Week
» 10113 Month
» 137556 Year
» 1802932 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2680 m/e 05/1945
British Railways 42680 w/e 19/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P05/1945
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 05/1945
Withdrawal Sat 27/03/1965
Service Life 19 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1945
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 24/02/1951
16A   Nottingham 4w/e 19/05/1951
14C   St Albans 4w/e 27/02/1954
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 16/01/1960
14E   Bedford w/e 21/05/1960
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 03/08/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/04/1964
10A   Carnforth w/e 09/05/1964
     Withdrawn on 27/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 17A Derby 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 16A Nottingham w/e 11/10/1947
LOAN 14B Kentish Town m/e 28/02/1951
EXLOAN 16A Nottingham w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 14C St Albans 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 14E Bedford 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 27/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12.
Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December.
SLS/195002
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop no. 1 bay) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
11/01/1960 St. Albans Closure St. Albans (14C) closed after dieselisation of St. Pancras-Bedford service on 11th January, 43119, 47261/554/642, 42134/680/6 being transferred to Cricklewood and 40026 to Bedford. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2680
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
19/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42680    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to St Albans (14C)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (14E)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
27/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42680    
08/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev