Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 905 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18708 Week
» 71724 Month
» 191251 Year
» 3218104 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2696 |
on |
11/10/1945 |
British Railways |
42696 |
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 11/10/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/08/1964 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1949 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40636/89, 1125/27, 2246, 42415, 2696, 4328, 14630, 55166, 56282, 16332, 57264, 17383. |
SLS/194908 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2696 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A) |
|
|
30/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42696 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fort William (65J) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
15/08/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42696 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|