Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2237 |
on |
23/08/1946 |
British Railways |
42237 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 23/08/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/12/1962 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
02/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
23/08/1947 |
LOAN |
14B |
Kentish Town |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
14B |
Kentish Town |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
17C |
Rowsley |
5w/e |
04/08/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2237 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42237 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42237 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|