Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 302 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2003 Week
» 10118 Month
» 137561 Year
» 1802937 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2247 on 11/10/1946
British Railways 42247 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P11/10/1946
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 11/10/1946
Withdrawal Sat 14/08/1965
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/10/1946
27A   Polmadie on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5E   Alsager 4w/e 16/06/1951
66D   Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 19/01/1957
67A   Corkerhill 4w/e 14/02/1959
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 06/02/1960
6H   Bangor w/e 18/06/1960
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 06/08/1960
5C   Stafford w/e 15/08/1964
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 03/10/1964
10A   Carnforth w/e 26/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 14/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 14/02/1959
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 07/05/1960
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 5C Stafford 4w/e 05/09/1964
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 14/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: E3071 (arrived at Derby on June 20th for testing purposes), ED3, D37, D62, D79, D104, D117/8, D176, D3018, D5009/27, D5135. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D3291. Test House: D46, D97, D173/5, D308, D5019. Shunter Test House: D3125. New Building: D180-D189. Finishing Shop: D63, D92, D177/8, D287. Erecting Shop: ED1, D3177, 13121, 41533, 42095, 42240/7, 44049, 44214, 44362, 47532, 48607, 73066/70, 73131/7/8, 75038/63. Paint Shop: D174, MR1000. 'Stone Pit': 44583, 48167, 48704. 'Foundry Row': 44030, 44158. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D38, D50, D5017, 10201/3, plus frames of an unidentified diesel shunter (d12000?). Shop Road: 48673. 'Bone Yard': 42146/84 (both stored). SLS/196208
10/08/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D48, D104, D132, D179, D5000/80, 10001. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D5, D178, D3125, D5017. Test House: D90, D122, D176, D5018, Pullman Coach No. uM60090. Shunter Test House: D3121. New Building: D183-D192. Finishing Shop: D68, D108, D180-D182, D5022. Erecting Shop: D2386, D3117/77, 12054, 42240/7, 42335, 42413, 44321, 44575, 48000, 48132, 48673, 48759, 73161/5. Paint Shop: D177, MR1000. Outside Paint Shop: 43994. 'Stone Pit': 73159, 75063. 'Foundry Row': 42069, 42500, 43216, 43682, 44122, 73131. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D58, D87, D96, D5014/28, D5134, 10201/3, 73137 (frames only). SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/10/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2247
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A)    
23/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42247    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Alsager (5E)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
06/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
14/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42247    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev