Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1104 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18907 Week
» 71923 Month
» 191450 Year
» 3218303 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2259 |
on |
04/12/1946 |
British Railways |
42259 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Fri 04/12/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 15/10/1965 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1966 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
04/12/1946 |
7B |
|
Bangor |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
66D |
|
Greenock Ladyburn |
8w/e |
17/04/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
North Wales |
Bangor shed received on 6/9 two new Class '2P' 2-6-2T's, Nos. 41212 an 41213 . Both are in the new black livery, lined out in red, straw and grey, the numbers being on the tank sides below the cab window and not on the coal bunker as on the earlier examples of the Class. Both locomotives are fitted for 'push and pull' working, and are to work on the Amlwch and Bethseda branches. No. 41213 made her first trip on the Amlwch branch on 9/9 when she worked the 3.55 p.m. from Bangor. In spite of spending nearly ten minutes at Llangefni disposing of a loaded cattle truck and a large number of parcels and luggage, the arrival at Amlwch was only 6 minutes late. A small crowd of interested railwaymen and others witnessed her departure from Bangor. Until the arrival of these two new 2-6-2T's, traffic on the Amlwch branch has been shared between 2-6-2T No. 1200 and Webb 2-4-2T No. 46687. The latter, although so aged, puts up a good performance on the branch and was noted touching 60 m.p.h. between Gaerwen and Menai Bridge when working the 10.45 a.m. from Amlwch on 9/9. The thrice-weekly goods train on the Holland Arms-Red Wharf Bay branch is worked by either 'Cauliflower' No. 28553 or one of the two tank versions of the Class stationed at Bangor-Nos. 6899 an 6906. Trains from Bangor to Afon Wen are shortly to be worked through to Pwllheli by ex L.M.S. engines and on this account most of the 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor for this duty are to be transferred else-where, since they are not suitable for working over the old Cambrian section of the former G.W.R. They are to be replaced by Stanier 2-6-2T's which will augment the few already there which include Nos. 72 an 124. 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor include Nos. 2258, 2259, 2260, 2261 an 2628. Bangor's rapidly dwindling band of Webb 'coal tanks' include Nos. 7730, 7765 an 7822. Three ex L. & Y. 0-6-0's, Nos. 12119, 12176 an 12407, are also at Bangor for short distance goods haulage. |
SLS/194811 |
11/07/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 42124, 42259, 42780, 44705/787, 45365, 45473, D359, D3009, D3533, D3741, D5128, D6124, D8076. Waiting Works: 42196, 42274, 42699, 42735, 44701, 45178. D3563, D5356. Ex-Works: 42736, 45053, D6123. Diesel Test House: D361, D3557. Works Shunters: D3412/6. Stored: GSWR 0-6-0T, D6100/1/2/4/6/7/14/8/20/5/7/30. |
SLS/196308 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/12/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2259 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42259 |
|
|
17/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
15/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42259 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|