Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 23 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 6388 Month
» 133831 Year
» 1799207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2282 on 25/08/1947
British Railways 42282 w/e 13/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P25/08/1947
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 25/08/1947
Withdrawal Sat 19/09/1964
Service Life 17 yrs , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/08/1947
26A   Newton Heath on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14D   Neasden 4w/e 14/06/1958
33C   Shoeburyness w/e 28/10/1961
6H   Bangor w/e 30/06/1962
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 30/08/1947
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/06/1962
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 11/08/1962
WDN   w/e 19/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/09/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/08/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2282
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
13/05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42282    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
28/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
19/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42282    
11/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev