Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 18 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4645 Week
» 6383 Month
» 133826 Year
» 1799202 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2283 on 01/09/1947
British Railways 42283 w/e 22/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P01/09/1947
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 01/09/1947
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 20 yrs , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 01/09/1947
26A   Newton Heath on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14D   Neasden 4w/e 14/06/1958
33C   Shoeburyness w/e 28/10/1961
6H   Bangor w/e 30/06/1962
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 01/02/1964
6H   Bangor w/e 13/06/1964
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 12/06/1965
9D   Newton Heath w/e 21/08/1965
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 06/08/1966
56F   Low Moor w/e 29/04/1967
     Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 06/09/1947
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/06/1962
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 06/08/1966
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 06/05/1967
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 20/05/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106
19/09/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
16/10/1961 Derby MPD (16C) (Ex Works on Shed) Ex Works on Shed: 42283, 47611, 48225/79, 48352, 53809, 75034. SLS/196111
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202
07/05/1962 Derby Works (Klondyke Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D63, D70, D84, D105, D168, D3117, D5028/88. Test House: D166/7, 13306, Midland Pullman coaches Nos. u60091/2, u60732/42. Shunter test house: D3067. New Building: D171-D180. Finishing Shop: D81, D169/170, 10203. Erecting Shop: D2504/8, D3019/68, D3368, 13051, 13120, 42071, 42178, 43949, 44210/33/44, 44571, 47004, 47228, 48098, 48386, 53808, 73053, 73140/58. Paint Shop: MR1000, 48687 (15D). 'Stone Pit': 48183, 73039. 'Foundry Row': 41168, 42099, 42352, 43263, 43410/35, 47340/66. 'Bone Yard': 42332. 'Klondyke Sidings': ED1, 12000, 42069, 42283, 43985, 44154, 44561, 44583, 48381. Shop Road: 44049/92, 48261/72, 68030. Works Shunt: D2377, D3168.
EXPLANATORY NOTES-Stone Pit: Track adjoining Diesel Finishing Shop. Foundry Row: Name explains itself. Bone Yard: Dump opposite station adjoining main Works Offices. Klondyke: Works arrival sidings between new Paint Shop and Test House.
SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/09/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2283
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
22/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42283    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
28/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
01/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42283    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev