Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 896 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19807 Week
» 84761 Month
» 287425 Year
» 3314278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2284 |
on |
08/09/1947 |
British Railways |
42284 |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 08/09/1947 to Newton Heath (26A) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/12/1964 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1962 |
Saltley MPD |
42053, 42284, 42707/84/90/823/7/900 are in store whilst 92167 (mechanical stoker) has been returned from the N.E.R.; on 20th October, 42791 (9G) was rostered to the Redditch-Alcester goods. |
SLS/196212 |
07/02/1965 |
Derby MPD (Stored) |
Stored: 42284/91. Waiting works: D107/57. Ex works: D2902/10, D7527. New ex Brush: D1804/10-14/6/8/9. |
SLS/196503 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/09/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2284 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42284 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42284 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|