Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 303 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2004 Week
» 10119 Month
» 137562 Year
» 1802938 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2198 on 13/03/1948
British Railways 42198 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P13/03/1948
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 13/03/1948
Withdrawal Sat 08/05/1965
Service Life 17 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/03/1948
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 06/02/1960
5D   Stoke w/e 22/04/1961
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 20/05/1961
6H   Bangor w/e 23/06/1962
10A   Carnforth w/e 09/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 08/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 31B Stirling w/e 13/03/1948
LOAN 31B Stirling w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 07/05/1960
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 03/06/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   w/e 08/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/04/1948 On loan to S.R. New 2-6-4T's Nos. 42198 an 42199 began comprehensive trials on the S.R. on April 19th. Specials were worked from Waterloo to Basingstoke, also Victoria to Tunbridge Wells West, and back. Workings were then arranged on ordinary trains based on Nine Elms, Stewarts Lane, Bricklayers' Arms, Ashford, Tunbridge Wells and Dover sheds in turn, with particular attention to the Oxted lines of the Central Section. On 24/4 No. 42199 worked a special from Victoria-Ashford and on the return journey, running bunker first, was observed at over 80 miles per hour near Staplehurst, while No. 42198 on a trial trip with 7 bogies (empty) ran non-stop Waterloo-Basingstoke in 46 minutes. SLS/194806
19/04/1948 On loan to S.R. New 2-6-4T's Nos. 42198 an 42199 began comprehensive trials on the S.R. on April 19th. Specials were worked from Waterloo to Basingstoke, also Victoria to Tunbridge Wells West, and back. Workings were then arranged on ordinary trains based on Nine Elms, Stewarts Lane, Bricklayers' Arms, Ashford, Tunbridge Wells and Dover sheds in turn, with particular attention to the Oxted lines of the Central Section. On 24/4 No. 42199 worked a special from Victoria-Ashford and on the return journey, running bunker first, was observed at over 80 miles per hour near Staplehurst, while No. 42198 on a trial trip with 7 bogies (empty) ran non-stop Waterloo-Basingstoke in 46 minutes. SLS/194806
29/06/1948 Stirling MPD 2-6-4T's Nos. 42198/99 arrived here on Tuesday night (29/6), after trials on the former Southern Rly. 'West Country' No. 34004 with black ex L.M.S. tender and lettered BR., was observed here on 3/7 at 5 p.m. on the 9.25 a.m. ex Crewe en route to Perth, being piloted by ex L.M.S. No. 4980. SLS/194808
31/12/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 626, 40642, 40919, 1171, 2191, 42198, 42905, 4001, 54446, 17470, 57569, 57640. SLS/195002
19/09/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
16/03/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D2, D110, D115, D122, D5018/35/75/6/80/6. Test House: D1, D3, D38, D75, D103, D161, D2213. New Building: D164-D173. Finishing Shop: D162/3, D5081/2/9. Erecting Shop: L. & N.W.R. 2650, D3124, 13117, 42089, 42198, 42343/50/85, 43453, 43950/85, 44092, 44262, 47003, 47165, 47336, 47427, 47627/67/74, 48182, 48211, 75035. Paint Shop: D160, 47643, 48490. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D123, D2506/8, D2912, D5022/92, D5133, 12000, 41168, 42332/56/63/75/87, 42448, 43410, 47218/59, 47601, 48099, 48442, 58228. Works Shunters: D2380, 47000, 47250. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/03/1948 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2198
Built at Derby Works
   
17/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42198    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
08/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42198    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev