Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4051 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17457 Week
» 70473 Month
» 190000 Year
» 3216853 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42159 |
on |
07/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 07/07/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/06/1966 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42159 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Albans (14C) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
07/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
21/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42159 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|