Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 42174 on 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P30/10/1948
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/10/1948
Withdrawal Sat 07/08/1965
Service Life 16 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/10/1948
17A   Derby 4w/e 31/12/1950
17A   Derby 4w/e 06/09/1952
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 20/12/1958
17A   Derby w/e 17/01/1959
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 22/09/1962
14E   Bedford w/e 30/03/1963
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 03/08/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 07/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 28C Carstairs w/e 30/10/1948
LOAN 17A Derby w/e 13/11/1948
EXLOAN 64D Carstairs w/e 14/05/1949
LOAN 17A Derby m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 06/09/1952
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 27/12/1958
EXLOAN 17A Derby 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 14E Bedford 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 3w/e 01/02/1964
WDN   w/e 07/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/03/1966 Awaiting Disposal (Shrewsbury) Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). SLS/196605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 42174
Built at Derby Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
17/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (14E)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42174    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev