Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14418 Week
» 67434 Month
» 186961 Year
» 3213814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42051 |
on |
14/09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 14/09/1950 to Kentish Town (14B) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/07/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/09/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42051 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42051 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|