Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 65 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 4729 Month
» 132172 Year
» 1797548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 42054 on 16/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P16/10/1950
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 16/10/1950 to Saltley (21A)
Withdrawal Sat 04/07/1964
Service Life 13 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
21A   Saltley (New) on 16/10/1950
16A   Nottingham w/e 02/05/1959
27E   Walton on the Hill w/e 04/08/1962
8L   Aintree w/e 14/12/1963
9D   Newton Heath w/e 14/03/1964
     Withdrawn on 04/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 21A Saltley w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 04/04/1964
WDN   w/e 04/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation).
New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages.
Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10).
Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler.
Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10).
SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 42054
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Saltley (21A)
   
02/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
04/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
07/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    
04/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42054    

prev prev