Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2180 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19983 Week
» 72999 Month
» 192526 Year
» 3219379 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42068 |
on |
20/10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
Sat 20/10/1950 to Ramsgate (74B) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/12/1963 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/10/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42068 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
27/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
10/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42068 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|