|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Brighton Works | Engines under repair include 680s, 30914 Eastbourne, 32082, 32106, 32449, 32482, and 77296/90360. New construction-42070-78 and 34110; the tanks are due out at the rate of one per week commencing with 42070 on 27/10 up to 42078 on 22/12. Addendum: The engines mentioned as under repair were all dealt with during November, and further tanks laid down up to 42084. | SLS/195012 |
31/01/1951 | Brighton Works | Engines recently off works include 32168 (unlined), 42081, 31550 (lined), 34110 66 Squadron. The output is somewhat slowed to approximately three per month, No. 42087 being due off shops on 19th March. Apart from engines frequently stored, and used only occasionally, most of the engines in the Brighton area have been renumbered: the latest is 32342, just through shops and lined black. The smaller size emblem is now generally used for this class. The W.D. 2-8-0 are very infrequent visitors now, several having left the Southern Region altogether. One of the Newhaven 'Terriers,' 2647, with 'Southern' and numerals on the tanks, was on the shed coalstage duty on 18th January. New tanks 42082-3 have been allotted boilers No. 13500/11, working pressure 200lb. (standard). Nos. 42080-3 are at Stewart's Lane in place of No. 42071-4. | SLS/195102 |
31/12/1961 | Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. | SLS/196202 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/11/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 42073 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (74A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
08/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
13/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (74A) | ||
18/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
11/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
31/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
14/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
01/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
12/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
30/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
15/07/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (55E) | ||
10/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42073 |