|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Brighton Works | Engines under repair include 680s, 30914 Eastbourne, 32082, 32106, 32449, 32482, and 77296/90360. New construction-42070-78 and 34110; the tanks are due out at the rate of one per week commencing with 42070 on 27/10 up to 42078 on 22/12. Addendum: The engines mentioned as under repair were all dealt with during November, and further tanks laid down up to 42084. | SLS/195012 |
31/01/1951 | Brighton Works | Engines recently off works include 32168 (unlined), 42081, 31550 (lined), 34110 66 Squadron. The output is somewhat slowed to approximately three per month, No. 42087 being due off shops on 19th March. Apart from engines frequently stored, and used only occasionally, most of the engines in the Brighton area have been renumbered: the latest is 32342, just through shops and lined black. The smaller size emblem is now generally used for this class. The W.D. 2-8-0 are very infrequent visitors now, several having left the Southern Region altogether. One of the Newhaven 'Terriers,' 2647, with 'Southern' and numerals on the tanks, was on the shed coalstage duty on 18th January. New tanks 42082-3 have been allotted boilers No. 13500/11, working pressure 200lb. (standard). Nos. 42080-3 are at Stewart's Lane in place of No. 42071-4. | SLS/195102 |
02/02/1951 | Eastbourne accident | On 2nd February the 6.40 p.m. Eastbourne-Polegate freight train, double-headed with No. 32543 piloting No. 42074, on leaving Eastbourne yard was routed in error on to the shed road, instead of the main line. Neither crew was aware of the error, though the guard of the train (20 vehicles and brake) detected it as he promptly applied his brake, vigorously but ineffectively. Standing at the water column were s1825 (Class N) and 42075, and a heavy collision occurred involving the four engines. Another loco, No. 32434, was following, and in danger of colliding with the train already involved, but rapid action by the guard already mentioned prevented further impact. No derailment occurred, but damage to buffer-beams, draw-gear, etc., was sustained by all four locos. Several days later the two tanks left for Brighton and the tender engines for Ashford. | SLS/195103 |
09/02/1964 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/11/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 42074 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (74A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
08/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
21/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
12/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
22/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) | ||
11/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H) | ||
05/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bangor (6H) | ||
12/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bangor (6H) | ||
04/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
11/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bangor (6H) | ||
12/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
20/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42074 | ||
12/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |