Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1445 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19248 Week
» 72264 Month
» 191791 Year
» 3218644 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4295 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
220 |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/12/1964 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4295 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
14/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4295 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|