Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
44747 |
on |
31/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
187 |
To Service |
Sat 31/07/1948 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/05/1963 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/07/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 44747 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
09/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44747 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|