Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 14 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4641 Week
» 6379 Month
» 133822 Year
» 1799198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4758 m/e 09/1947
British Railways 44758 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five09/1947
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 187
To Service During 09/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/07/1968
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1968 at Cohens (Cargo Fleet)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1947
5A   Crewe North on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5A   Crewe North w/e 31/01/1948
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/06/1959
9A   Longsight w/e 18/06/1960
8A   Edge Hill w/e 10/09/1960
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 23/06/1962
10A   Carnforth w/e 23/04/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 20/07/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 29A Perth South w/e 20/09/1947
LOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 9A Longsight 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 20/07/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 Crewe Works Nos. 4758 , 4759 and 4760 the first three Class 5 4-6-0's with roller bearings (Order E467) were completed on 2/9, 11/9, and 18/9 respectively. Class 5 4-6-0's Nos. 4826 and 4827 were converted to oil-burning w/e 6/9 and 13/9 respectively whilst Nos. 4830 and 4844 were both dealt with in a similar manner during w/e 20/9. The latest 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt was No. 6111 , which was completed on 10/9. Nos. 6228 and 6245 will be the next 'Pacifics' to have the streamline casing removed. No. 6202 went into traffic again on 10/9, having been on Works since 18/8. Ex L. & .N.W.R. No. 9336 (withdrawn w/e 2/8/47) was finally cut-up during w/e 6/9/47. Additional engines cut up were: Nos. 25797 w/e 13/9, 27552 and 28603 w/e 20/9. The ex L. &Y. 0-6-2T (Stationary boiler No. 4608) has recently been through the Works and has been completely repainted black. It is lettered LMS in standard size letters on the tank sides together with the number 4608 on the bunker sides. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4758
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
31/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44758    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
20/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 44758    
10/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Cargo Fleet    

prev prev