30/09/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Nos. 4758 , 4759 and 4760 the first three Class 5 4-6-0's with roller bearings (Order E467) were completed on 2/9, 11/9, and 18/9 respectively. Class 5 4-6-0's Nos. 4826 and 4827 were converted to oil-burning w/e 6/9 and 13/9 respectively whilst Nos. 4830 and 4844 were both dealt with in a similar manner during w/e 20/9. The latest 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt was No. 6111 , which was completed on 10/9. Nos. 6228 and 6245 will be the next 'Pacifics' to have the streamline casing removed. No. 6202 went into traffic again on 10/9, having been on Works since 18/8. Ex L. & .N.W.R. No. 9336 (withdrawn w/e 2/8/47) was finally cut-up during w/e 6/9/47. Additional engines cut up were: Nos. 25797 w/e 13/9, 27552 and 28603 w/e 20/9. The ex L. &Y. 0-6-2T (Stationary boiler No. 4608) has recently been through the Works and has been completely repainted black. It is lettered LMS in standard size letters on the tank sides together with the number 4608 on the bunker sides. |
SLS/194710 |
07/12/1947 |
Crewe Works |
New Construction 7/12: In addition to Nos. 6256 and 4765 mentioned, No. 4766 was complete. No. 4767 had the frames, cylinders and boiler mounted, No. 4748 frames and cylinders-boiler not yet mounted-while frames and cylinders for Nos. 4749/50 were all in the Erecting Shop. The frames and cylinders of Nos: 4751/2 were in the Yard, while the Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for No. 6257. The frames only of Nos. 4753/54/55 were visible. Nos. 4759/61 were under repair, while No. 4762 was on the North Shed. No less than 13 of the L.N.E.R. '0.6's' were on the Works. |
SLS/194801 |
07/02/1953 |
Edinburgh, Murrayfield |
Once again the International Rugby Match between Scotland and Wales provided Edinburgh with its biggest influx of special trains for any one event, 31 arriving between Thursday and Saturday morning from Wales, 24 at Princes Street, 7 at Waverley. On Thursday, 5 arrived at Princes Street during the day and among the locos were Nos. 45725 (19B) and 45552 (5A). The coaches included a set of Southern malachite green boat train coaches, a number of which were second class. All Thursday's locos were sent to Carstairs. Friday produced another 6 at Princes Street headed by such Jubilee's as 45686 (5A); 45627 (14B), 45703 (3B); 45735 (1B); and 45742 (9A). On Saturday 7 arrived at Waverley, 3 of which were hauled by 64B locos the rest by Stanier 5, 44711 (2A); 44759 (5A); 44774 (20A) and 44775 (20A). The 13 arrivals due at Princes Street started at 4.23 a.m. continuing till 10.16 a.m. Among the foreigners were 46166 (5A); 45654 (19B); 46138 (1B); 45670 (8A). The average number of cars per train was eleven and most trains had restaurant cars, all of which were Western Region with W.R. men who were provided with sleeping accommodation in five sleeping cars in Lothian Road Goods Yard. The return working of these trains started at 10.0 p.m. on Saturday and they continued to leave at roughly 10 minute intervals till 1.0 p.m. on Sunday, with breaks only between 2.10 a.m. till 9.5 am. and 10.10 a.m. and 11.25 a.m. The 7 from Waverley left between 11 p.m. and 2 a.m. Saturday night. Great credit is due to all concerned that only one train was over an hour in arriving; this was due to the one and only engine failure. Even greater credit is due to the organisation which successfully got every train out of Princes Street on time, on Sunday, and there is no doubt that a great victory over the buses was achieved. |
SLS/195304 |
08/10/1961 |
Crewe Works (Paint Shop) |
Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. |
SLS/196111 |
15/11/1963 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). |
SLS/196312 |
27/06/1965 |
Crewe Works (Ex-Works: rks) |
Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. |
SLS/196508 |