Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 33 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4660 Week
» 6398 Month
» 133841 Year
» 1799217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4776 m/e 06/1947
British Railways 44776 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five06/1947
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 187
To Service During 06/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/10/1967
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1968 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1947
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley w/e 17/04/1948
17A   Derby w/e 02/10/1948
19B   Sheffield Millhouses 8w/e 11/07/1953
17A   Derby 4w/e 03/10/1953
21A   Saltley 4w/e 28/11/1953
17A   Derby w/e 13/10/1962
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 09/03/1963
21A   Saltley w/e 22/06/1963
2A   Tyseley w/e 02/10/1965
6C   Croes Newydd w/e 12/11/1966
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 27/05/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 21/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 14B Kentish Town w/e 07/06/1947
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 17/04/1948
ALLOC 17A Derby w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 21A Saltley 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/09/1966 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. SLS/196610

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4776
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
17/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
04/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44776    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
21/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44776    
04/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev