Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4780 m/e 07/1947
British Railways 44780 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five07/1947
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 187
To Service During 07/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1968 at Cohens (Cargo Fleet)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1947
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 08/05/1948
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 11/08/1956
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 30/05/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/11/1959
9A   Longsight w/e 18/06/1960
5A   Crewe North w/e 26/11/1960
1E   Bletchley w/e 06/05/1961
1A   Willesden w/e 10/06/1961
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 23/06/1962
1A   Willesden w/e 06/02/1965
2A   Tyseley w/e 02/10/1965
6D   Shrewsbury w/e 17/09/1966
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 18/03/1967
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 19/08/1967
9D   Newton Heath w/e 09/12/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 25A Wakefield w/e 26/07/1947
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 08/05/1948
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 9A Longsight 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 1A Willesden 3w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/10/1966
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 08/04/1967
LOAN 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 09/09/1967
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 30/12/1967
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1954 York Area The Holbeck (20A) turn to Scarborough mentioned in last month's notes has brought most of the Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's from Holbeck into York on various occasions; 73045 also appears frequently. 44810 (21A) appeared on it on 6/3/54. 44780 (25B) was under repair in York shed on 12/2/54. 61131 (37A) worked the 9.22 a.m. York to King's Cross as far as Doncaster on 12/2/54 instead of the customary Doncaster A3 or V2. 61131 returned to York at 1.26 p.m. on the 7.20 a.m. from Colchester. This latter train is normally hauled by a Doncaster B1, although V2's from New England are occasionally used instead. Two Scottish Region A3's called at York shed recently, returning north after overhaul at Doncaster Works, namely 60100 (64B) on 19/2/54 and 60095 (68E) on 3/3/54. 46465 (31A) was at York shed on 12/3/54, returning, to Cambridge after overhaul at Darlington Works. On 24/2/54 90145 (40B) arrived at York from the Hull via Market Weighton line hauling 69094 (53A) for Darlington Works. 67739 (32B) was also at York shed on the same date en route for Darlington Works in a very dilapidated condition.
Pantomime excursions to Leeds were run on 2/3/54 from both Scarborough and Kirbymoorside. One of the two Scarborough trains called at Weaverthorpe, Rillington, Strensall and Haxby stations, which have been closed to regular passenger traffic for many years. The excursion from Kirbymoorside called at Nawton, Helmsley, Gilling and Coxwold (closed early in 1953).
SLS/195404

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4780
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
08/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
17/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44780    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
30/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
06/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
18/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
19/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 44780    
10/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Cargo Fleet    

prev prev