Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 172 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1241 Week
» 1241 Month
» 68103 Year
» 1733479 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4816 m/e 11/1944
British Railways 44816 w/e 13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1944
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 170
To Service During 11/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/07/1968
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1968 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1944
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 03/01/1948
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 10/01/1959
17A   Derby w/e 24/03/1962
17B   Burton w/e 22/09/1962
27C   Southport w/e 25/05/1963
8K   Bank Hall w/e 20/06/1964
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 27/06/1964
9K   Bolton w/e 18/09/1965
8K   Bank Hall w/e 30/04/1966
8L   Aintree w/e 22/10/1966
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 17/06/1967
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 07/10/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 20/07/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 03/01/1948
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 08/07/1967
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 4w/e 07/10/1967
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 20/07/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1959 FA Cup excursions The Norwich-Luton cup replay of 18th March brought the following to Birmingham New Street-Bls 61046/8 of 32A, 61204 of 31F and 61270/317 of 32A; Class 5s 44810/6 an 45238, all 14A. SLS/195904
09/02/1964 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. SLS/196403

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4816
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
03/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
13/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44816    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
18/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
06/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    
20/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 44816    

prev prev