Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 289 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1197 Week
» 12342 Month
» 112127 Year
» 1777503 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4817 m/e 11/1944
British Railways 44817 w/e 03/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1944
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 170
To Service During 11/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/08/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1944
14A   Cricklewood East on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B   Kentish Town w/e 19/03/1949
17B   Burton w/e 14/04/1962
26C   Bolton w/e 25/05/1963
26A   Newton Heath w/e 22/06/1963
9J   Agecroft w/e 23/11/1963
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/10/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 12/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 04/10/1947
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 19/03/1949
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 9J Agecroft 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 12/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4817
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A)    
03/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44817    
19/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
14/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (9J)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
12/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44817    
12/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev