Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 29 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4656 Week
» 6394 Month
» 133837 Year
» 1799213 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4819 m/e 11/1944
British Railways 44819 w/e 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1944
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 170
To Service During 11/1944
Withdrawal During 11/1967 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 23 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1944
17A   Derby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
19B   Sheffield Millhouses m/e 16/06/1956
17A   Derby 4w/e 06/10/1956
14D   Neasden w/e 21/02/1959
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 18/06/1960
17A   Derby w/e 08/12/1962
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 25/05/1963
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 05/09/1964
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/05/1967
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 05/09/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905
01/05/1959 Rugby Works On 1st May u/r-42253(14D), 45137(14E), 45269(21A), 49081(5C), 49216(3A). Awaiting works-44819(14D), 73127(26F). SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4819
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44819    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
05/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44819 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev