Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4831 m/e 08/1944
British Railways 44831 w/e 13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five08/1944
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 170
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal During 11/1967 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 23 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
2A   Rugby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5D   Stoke w/e 04/08/1962
2A   Rugby w/e 18/08/1962
5E   Nuneaton w/e 29/05/1965
6J   Holyhead w/e 04/06/1966
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 10/12/1966
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/05/1967
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 01/09/1962
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/02/1964 Crewe Works (Works Yard) Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. SLS/196403

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4831
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
13/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44831    
04/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
18/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44831 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev