Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4848 m/e 11/1944
British Railways 44848 w/e 05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1944
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 170
To Service During 11/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/02/1968
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1968 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1944
20A   Holbeck (MR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley w/e 17/01/1948
17A   Derby w/e 02/10/1948
68A   Carlisle Kingmoor 8w/e 05/09/1953
19B   Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 03/10/1953
17A   Derby 4w/e 08/10/1955
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 10/01/1959
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 17/03/1962
16B   Annesley w/e 11/07/1964
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 25/12/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 25/12/1965
10F   Rose Grove w/e 02/04/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 17/02/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 17A Derby w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 08/08/1953
EXLOAN 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 03/10/1953
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 16B Annesley 5w/e 11/07/1964
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 09/04/1966
WDN 10F Rose Grove w/e 17/02/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Manchester (London Road) Station Interesting locos seen during October included: 2573 10C, 4848 20A, 4076 2C, 4885 12A, 4901 12A, 4904, 5168 30A, 5284 19E SLS/194601
27/02/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 44794, 44848, 44900, 45044/80, 45130, 45268/84/92, 48010/317, 92026/87/93, 92208/33, D220/3/41/83/99, D338, D1551/66/75/86, D1603/11/97, D1707/33, D1996-9, D1100-4, D5706, D8010/6; Electric shop: E3037/41/5/67/168, 26013/34/53, 27003; New Diesel shop: D243/70, D352/3/90, D1507/15/21/3/7, D1646/89/778, D1910/75; Works yard: D209, D1599, D1720, 45493, 48037/121, 70038; Traverser area: D272/8, D1503/17/24, D1675, D1863, D1914/71, D5715, E3049; On Test: D313/80/99, D1528/45/58, D1683, D1741/6, D8008; Paint shop: D259, D331, D1991-5, D292/6, D5709, D8050, E3102, 45096, 48062/3, 92020 and stored 46235, 71000. SLS/196604

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4848
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
05/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44848    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
11/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16B)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
02/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
17/02/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 44848    
07/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev