Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 473 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5460 Week
» 13575 Month
» 141018 Year
» 1806394 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4858 m/e 12/1944
British Railways 44858 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five12/1944
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 170
To Service During 12/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Service Life 23 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1944
19A   Sheffield Grimesthorpe on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16A   Nottingham 4w/e 17/05/1958
21A   Saltley w/e 21/11/1959
17A   Derby w/e 07/04/1962
17B   Burton w/e 22/09/1962
16C   Derby w/e 14/08/1965
16B   Colwick w/e 27/08/1966
8L   Aintree w/e 12/11/1966
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/06/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 16C Derby 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 10/09/1966
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4858
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A)    
04/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44858    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
14/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
27/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44858    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev