Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1084 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14490 Week
» 67506 Month
» 187033 Year
» 3213886 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4861 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
44861 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 01/1945 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1967 off Newton Heath (9D) |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1968 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16C |
Derby |
4w/e |
05/12/1964 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
10/07/1965 |
WDN |
9D |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4861 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44861 |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44861 from Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|