Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 38 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4665 Week
» 6403 Month
» 133846 Year
» 1799222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4892 m/e 09/1945
British Railways 44892 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five09/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 174
To Service During 09/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/04/1967
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1945
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10B   Preston w/e 10/06/1950
10B   Preston 2w/e 17/06/1950
12B   Carlisle Canal 4w/e 16/06/1951
11A   Carnforth w/e 30/06/1951
11A   Carnforth 4w/e 17/07/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 09/08/1958
24L   Carnforth 4w/e 04/10/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 08/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 10/06/1950
LOAN 12B Carlisle Canal w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 30/06/1951
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 09/08/1958
EXLOAN 24L Carnforth 4w/e 04/10/1958
WDN   w/e 08/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107
15/11/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4892
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44892    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
08/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44892    
12/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev