|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/03/1965 | Crewe Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. | SLS/196505 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4905 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) | ||
25/03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44905 | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) | ||
30/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
15/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
12/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
11/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44905 from Carnforth (10A) | ||
02/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |