Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 55 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2981 Week
» 4719 Month
» 132162 Year
» 1797538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4910 m/e 11/1945
British Railways 44910 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five11/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 174
To Service During 11/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1945
2A   Rugby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 24/02/1951
6A   Chester (MR) m/e 28/02/1951
12A   Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 10/09/1955
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 08/10/1955
3D   Aston w/e 27/02/1960
21B   Bescot w/e 07/05/1960
21E   Monument Lane w/e 15/07/1961
21B   Bescot w/e 02/09/1961
2E   Saltley w/e 03/04/1965
5B   Crewe South w/e 19/06/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 21/08/1965
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/06/1967
9D   Newton Heath w/e 06/01/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 2A Rugby m/e 30/11/1945
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) m/e 28/02/1951
LOAN 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 10/09/1955
EXLOAN 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 3D Aston 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 21E Monument Lane 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 21B Bescot 4w/e 02/09/1961
ALLOC 2E Saltley 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 08/07/1967
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 06/01/1968
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/08/1947 Roade Station On 7/8, at 5 p.m., No. 9083 coupled to No. 9334 was noted at the north end of the station, with its tender and rear pair of coupled wheels derailed, thus blocking the up fast line to Euston. No. 4910(2A) was sent from Rugby with the breakdown crane. SLS/194709
30/11/1950 Derby Works In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed.
Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal.
SLS/195101
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4910
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44910    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E)    
02/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 44910    
11/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev