Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 15 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4642 Week
» 6380 Month
» 133823 Year
» 1799199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4920 m/e 12/1945
British Railways 44920 w/e 24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five12/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 174
To Service During 12/1945
Withdrawal During 11/1967 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1945
21A   Saltley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 18/05/1963
16C   Derby w/e 23/11/1963
40E   Colwick w/e 25/12/1965
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 20/08/1966
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/05/1967
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 07/12/1963
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 10/09/1966
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/07/1961 St. Rollox Works (Steam Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D3132, D3410, D3528, D5300/3/10/1, D6120/37. Works Yard : 42243, 45157, 45489/92, 57328, 57631, D6111. Steam Erecting Shop: 42690/3, 42804, 42913, 44724, 44820/98, 44920/55, 45047, 45118, 45687/96, 45727, 57617. Waiting Works : 42167, 42780, 44722. Ex-Works: D3279, 42882, 44954, 45083, 45126. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4920
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
24/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44920    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
20/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44920 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev