Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14417 Week
» 67433 Month
» 186960 Year
» 3213813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4926 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
British Railways |
44926 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 02/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/04/1968 off Edge Hill (8A) |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4926 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44926 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
06/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (9H) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
20/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44926 from Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|