Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1591 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19394 Week
» 72410 Month
» 191937 Year
» 3218790 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4933 |
m/e |
10/1945 |
British Railways |
44933 |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 10/1945 to Dalry Road (28B) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 14 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4933 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44933 |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44933 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|