Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 198 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18001 Week
» 71017 Month
» 190544 Year
» 3217397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4951 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
44951 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 03/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 14/12/1966 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4951 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44951 |
|
|
13/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
14/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44951 |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|