30/11/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 40170, 40651/63, 687, 40907/09, 912/22, 1129/34, 41177, 1182, 2691, 42699, 2736, 42749, 2880, 42927, 44699, 44900, 4956, 44959/75, 45029/49, 45117/23/52/72, 45251, 45356/62/63, 45463/64/74/85/90, 45575/79, 45728, 7332, 47540, 14450, 14500/01, 55200, 15203/29, 16152, 56170, 16318, 56320, 16328/34, 17270, 57312, 17437, 17593, 17642. On 12/11, No. 54472, the first ex C.R. locomotive to bear the crest was ex Works. |
SLS/195001 |
31/03/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 595, 612, 40907/11, 42208, 42415, 42738/44/57, 42805, 42916, 43973, 4183, 44801, 44956, 45085/86, 45100/16/17/56/61/64/68/92, 45356, 45458/75/80/83/89/99, 45646, 46121, 14443, 54460, 54649, 56153, 16230/33, 56240, 16241, 56263, 16288, 16322/30/47, 17265, 57272, 57311/35, 17410/44/46, 57566, 17628, 57652. |
SLS/195005 |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
17/05/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) Works (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: 42125, 42264/5, 44991/4, 45016/214/45/365/472, D3005, D3210, D3544, D5121/9, D6110/33, D8076, D8112, D264. Waiting Works: 44796, 44956, 45478, 45356, 45423, 45471. Ex-Works: 44720, D366. Diesel Test House: D3410. Works Shunters: D3408, D3739, D3904. Stored: 45178, D6100/1/2/6/7/20/4/5/7/30. |
SLS/196304 |
03/09/1964 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
Shopped in 25 weeks ending 29th August: 44880, 44999, 45011, 45194, 64620, 65915, 76096, 76114, 80128, D3552, D3902, D5328, D6110/20/43/46, D8029/33/34. Scrapped 9th-28th March: 61117, 45465. no scrapping after that date. In Shops: 44956, 45016, 45213, 78054, D2414, D6116/17/19/38/41/52/55/56, D8576. Stored: 62712. In the above period there were unscheduled repairs on 13 steam locomotives and 70 diesel locomotives. The Clayton locomotives are being fitted with AWS, ten to date. (I regret the length of time which has elapsed between this and the last report but the epidemic prevented visits). |
SLS/196410 |
14/10/1964 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
Shopped during the five weeks ending 9th October : 44718, 78054, D3558; In shops for minor repairs, modification, etc.: 44956, 45016, 46464, 64608, D264, D2416/23, D3902, D5116/21/27/30/32, D5214, D5300, D6116/36/42/48/52/55, D8094, D8554/71/76; in shops : 44925, 65905, D2414, D3549, D6117/19/38/51; Stored: 62712. |
SLS/196411 |