Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 31 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 849 Week
» 17800 Month
» 170753 Year
» 1836129 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4961 on 15/06/1946
British Railways 44961 w/e 11/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five15/06/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 174
To Service Mon 15/06/1946 to Perth South (29A)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964
Service Life 18 yrs , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
29A   Perth South (New) on 15/06/1946
     Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 1179, 42203, 2207, 42793, 42876, 42918, 4901, 44957/60, 4961/69, 44999, 45155/73/4/5/94, 45320/55, 45443/84, 45583, 14493, 15172, 55238, 56254, 16274, 16333/64/71, 17276, 57292, 57361, 57417, 17550/79, 17682. No. 45575 was turned out on 14/1 in the new green livery-the first locomotive to be painted here in colours since the war. The 'Great Western' effect was enhanced by the fact that it has a domeless boiler. The St. Rollox tradition of having numbering of a different size to other works is retained, the numbers being of the larger size, as on the black locomotives painted here. The front numberplate and shedplate were at one time painted red, but were blacked over before completion. Nos. 54507 an 55199 following No. 45575 from the Paint Shop, have both had the background of their numberplates painted red. Another of the few remaining 'Jubilee's' with domeless boilers-No. 45579-is also in the Works, The Works' shunter-No. 56025-has been the object of a commendable piece of enterprise. On completion of its overhaul it has been beautifully repainted with full lining-even the front of the cab being lined-with crests of the smaller type on the saddle tanks. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4961
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Perth South (29A)
   
11/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 44961    
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44961    
09/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev