Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 339 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2040 Week
» 10155 Month
» 137598 Year
» 1802974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4962 on 15/06/1946
British Railways 44962 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five15/06/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 174
To Service Sat 15/06/1946 to Derby (17A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
17A   Derby (New) on 15/06/1946
22A   Bristol Barrow Road w/e 15/01/1949
20A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/07/1949
20A   Holbeck (MR) 5w/e 16/07/1949
19B   Sheffield Millhouses w/e 13/08/1949
21A   Saltley 4w/e 01/12/1951
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 18/05/1963
16C   Derby w/e 23/11/1963
16F   Burton w/e 12/09/1964
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/04/1966
9D   Newton Heath w/e 09/12/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 17A Derby w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 15/01/1949
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 16F Burton w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 09/04/1966
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 30/12/1967
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4962
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44962    
15/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
09/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
02/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44962    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev