Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 541 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3467 Week
» 5205 Month
» 132648 Year
» 1798024 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5001 m/e 04/1935
British Railways 45001 w/e 19/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 5MT
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Black Five04/1935
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number 114
Works Number 217
To Service During 04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/03/1968
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1935
8B   Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7C   Holyhead w/e 07/07/1951
7C   Holyhead 4w/e 17/07/1951
5A   Crewe North w/e 15/09/1951
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 06/10/1951
8C   Speke Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
5B   Crewe South w/e 07/11/1959
5A   Crewe North w/e 20/06/1964
5B   Crewe South w/e 19/09/1964
1F   Rugby w/e 28/11/1964
5E   Nuneaton w/e 29/05/1965
6J   Holyhead w/e 04/06/1966
10A   Carnforth w/e 10/12/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 16/03/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7C Holyhead w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 1F Rugby 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 31/12/1966
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 16/03/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5001
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 217
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
19/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45001    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (7C)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (7C)    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
16/03/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45001    
06/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev